skip to content

Almehmadi, Fahad Saleh M

CPSO#: 92607

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Umm Al-Qura University Faculty of Medici, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital - Ouellet
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4411 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Almehmadi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 30 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Almehmadi ( CPSO# 92607 )

Business Address:
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 567-5516


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Saudi Arabia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:22 Jul 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:16 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FAHAD SALEH M ALMEHMADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALMEHMADI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Apr 2010 to 28 May 2010
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 23 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 20 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 21 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 20 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 03 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Cardiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Cardiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Mar 2019
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2014