skip to content

Almakki, Nazar Elnour Mohamed

CPSO#: 90811

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Sep 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Sep 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Khartoum, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite # 202
3630 Lawrence Ave East
Scarborough ON  M1G 1P6
Phone: (416) 792-0836
Fax: (416) 792-0837 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

520 Ellesmere Rd Unit # G118
Scarborough ON  M1R0B1
Canada
Phone: 4166739370
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Almakki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Timol ( CPSO# 87223 )
Dr. N. Almakki ( CPSO# 90811 )

Business Address:
202 - 3630 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1G 1P6
Phone Number: (416) 792-0836

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:05 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:09 Apr 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:09 Apr 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NAZAR ELNOUR MOHAMED ALMAKKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALMAKKI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jun 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009