skip to content

Almakadi, Mohammed Saleh A

CPSO#: 90385

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 May 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cancer Center
Division of Malignant Hematology
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9495
Fax: (905) 575-6340 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

1280 Main Street West
MDCL 5116
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Canada
Phone: 9055259140 Ext. 21872
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Mohammed Almakadi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Almakadi ( CPSO# 90385 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 387-9495

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital & Cancer Center
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Business Address:
St Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
219 Queenston Street
St Catharines ON  L2P 2W9
Phone Number: (905) 685-8082

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 30 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOHAMMED SALEH A ALMAKADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALMAKADI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 May 2009 to 26 Jun 2009
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 27 Jun 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2013