skip to content

Almakadi, Mohammed Saleh A

CPSO#: 90385

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Nov 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Sep 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Mohammed Almakadi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 1 2021

Medical Records Location

Address: Juravinski Hospital & Cancer Centre, 711 Concession St. Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Date Received: 06 Nov 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective:30 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 May 2009 to 26 Jun 2009
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 27 Jun 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Nov 2020