skip to content

Allison, Patrick James

CPSO#: 85771

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2
2120 Regent Street South
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Z9
Phone: (705) 522-9101
Fax: (705) 522-5744 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Patrick Allison Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Allison ( CPSO# 85771 )

Business Address:
Suite 2
2120 Regent Street South
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Z9
Phone Number: (705) 522-9101

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PATRICK JAMES ALLISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLISON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 20 Nov 2006 to 14 Dec 2006
EL - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009