skip to content

Allen, Albert Nguyenhoang

CPSO#: 88359

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sioux Lookout
First Nations Health Authority
55 Queen Street
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1B8
Phone: (647) 557-3622
Fax: 647-689-3288 Electoral District: 09

Additional Practice Location(s)

Asian Clinic
Hong Fook Mental Health Association
130 Dundas Street West, 3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 1C3
Canada
Phone: (416) 493-4242
Fax: (416) 595-6332
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Albert Allen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 2 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALBERT NGUYENHOANG ALLEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Aug 2017
CF - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013