skip to content

Allehebi, Riyad Omar N

CPSO#: 97401

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 16 Aug 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 12 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Umm Al Qura University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:31 Aug 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:19 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 04 Apr 2012 to 01 May 2012
EL - Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jul 2013
EL - Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Aug 2016
CF - Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Aug 2017
CF - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 May 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2015
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 16 Aug 2018