skip to content

Allard, Christopher Brian

CPSO#: 90763

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 May 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 May 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
460 Brant St, Unit 12
Burlington ON  L7R4B6
Phone: 905 635 8103
Fax: 905 333 1616 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher Allard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Allard ( CPSO# 90763 )

Business Address:
Suite 12
460 Brant Street
Burlington ON  L7R 4B6
Phone Number: (905) 635-8103

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Oakville Trafalgar,Memorial Hospit Oakville
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER BRIAN ALLARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 2016