skip to content

Alkhattabi, Maan Sadaqa M

CPSO#: 100012

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Apr 2019
EXPIRY DATE
07 Apr 2022
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 08 Apr 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
Schulich School of Medicine
University of Western Ontario
Room M106 Medical Science Building
London ON  N6A 5C1
Phone: 5196858500 Ext. 19968 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

LHSC - University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Canada
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Apr 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2019
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 07 Apr 2022

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 08 Apr 2019 Active
             1.    Dr.   Maan  Sadaqa  M  Alkhattabi  may  practise  internal  medicine  and
                  gastroenterology  at  the  following  locations,  while under supervision
                  coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College:

                  (i)   London  Health  Sciences  Centre  - Victoria  Hospital  in  London,
                        Ontario;
                  
                  (ii)  London  Health  Sciences Centre - University  Hospital  in  London,
                        Ontario;
                  
                  (iii) St. Joseph's Health Care London in London, Ontario; and
                  
                  (iv)  as  a  clinical fellow  in  the  gastroenterology  program  at  the
                        University of Western Ontario.
                  
            2.    The certificate  of  registration  automatically expires three years from
                  the date of issuance.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns  regarding  Dr.
                        Alkhattabi's  knowledge,  skill,  judgment  or  attitude,  does not
                        provide the required reports to the College by the due date  or  if
                        the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue to
                        supervise Dr. Alkhattabi's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on April 8, 2019, and will expire on or before
                  April 7, 2022, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.