skip to content

Aljawad, Mohammed Saleh H

CPSO#: 92621

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 11 Oct 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Faisal University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: London Health Sciences Centre, 800 Commissioners Road East, London, ON, N6A 5W9
Date Received: 24 May 2016


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:14 Jul 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:29 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 14 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 14 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Gastroenterology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016