skip to content

Aljassem, Kinda

CPSO#: 95364

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Apr 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Apr 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
101 Humber College Blvd.
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: 4164942120 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: K. Aljassem Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 26 2019

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:10 Aug 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KINDA ALJASSEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALJASSEM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 10 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 11 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 10 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 11 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 07 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 08 Sep 2016 to 13 Nov 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Nov 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2017