skip to content

Aljarad, Abdulqader Maqbul Akouf

CPSO#: 91919

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Sep 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
CF - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2010