skip to content

Aljabbary, Talal Fahad

CPSO#: 97309

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Mar 2012
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education as of 05 May 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Cardiology
Room D 408
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 480-6066 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:18 Oct 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TALAL FAHAD ALJABBARY shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALJABBARY is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. ALJABBARY shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALJABBARY is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALJABBARY shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALJABBARY is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALJABBARY no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2021.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Mar 2012 to 04 May 2012
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 05 May 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 May 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2021