skip to content

Alisic, Sarika Amelia

CPSO#: 93050

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Mann, Sarika Amelia (used until: 06 Nov 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Dept of Anesthesiology, B302
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: 613-798-5555 Ext. 13680 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sarika A. Alisic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Alisic ( CPSO# 93050 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital- Civic Campus
Department of Anesthesiology
B307 - 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4169

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
CCW 1401 - 501 Symth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8187

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SARIKA AMELIA ALISIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALISIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pain Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pain Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 24 Nov 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pain Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015