skip to content

Alingary-Akbari, Nelab

CPSO#: 98207

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Apr 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Apr 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Alingary, Nelab (used until: 25 May 2017 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Pashto

Education:University Of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Oshawa Medical Centre
1400 Ritson Rd N
Oshawa ON  L1G 7W4
Phone: 905-433-1690 Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NELAB ALINGARY-AKBARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALINGARY-AKBARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2017