skip to content

Alija, Agron

CPSO#: 91203

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Feb 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Feb 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Albanian, Croatian, English, German, Serbian

Education:UNIVERSITY OF PRISTINA, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Active Care Medical Centre
201-1807 Wonderland Rd. N
London ON  N6A 5C2
Phone: (519) 433-2996
Fax: (519) 433-4332 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

Four Counties Health Services
R R 3
Newbury ON  N0L 1Z0
Canada
Phone: (519) 693-4441
Fax: (519) 693-7084
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. A. Alija Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 13 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Alija ( CPSO# 91203 )

Business Address:
1807 Wonderland Road North
London ON  N6G 5C2
Phone Number: (519) 433-4330

Business Address:
1824 Concession Drive
RR #3
Newbury ON  N0L 1Z0
Phone Number: (519) 653-4441

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Four Counties Health Services,Newbury Newbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AGRON ALIJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALIJA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
AVP - Family Medicine

Western University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2013