skip to content

Ali, Syed T

CPSO#: 86989

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
381 Cedar Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 2J2
Phone: (519) 426-3366
Fax: (519) 426-3267 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ali and Mazhar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ali ( CPSO# 86989 )
Dr. A. Mazhar ( CPSO# 95543 )

Business Address:
387 Cedar Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 2J2
Phone Number: (519) 426-3366

Business Address:
500-71 King Street West
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A2
Phone Number: (905) 270-0415

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
West Haldimand,General Hospital Hagersville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SYED T ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - General Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2012