skip to content

Ali, Sammy Hatem

CPSO#: 88487

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone: (519) 741-5252
Fax: (519) 741-5772 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

911 Queen's Blvd
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
Phone: (519) 744-3311
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

835 King St W
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
Phone: (519) 749-4300
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

500 Whites Rd
Palmerston ON  N0G 2P0
Canada
Phone: (519) 343-2030
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

255 Elizabeth St E
Listowel ON  N4W 2P5
Canada
Phone: (519) 291-3120
County: County of Perth
Electoral District: 02

235 Union St E
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Canada
Phone: (519) 843-2010
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sammy H. Ali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ali ( CPSO# 88487 )

Business Address:
Suite 206
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone Number: (519) 741-5252

Business Address:
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:02 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SAMMY HATEM ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012