skip to content

Ali, Kevin Fareez

CPSO#: 96374

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Aug 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of the Americas (Beli, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 001
125 Bell Farm Road
Barrie ON  L4M 6L2
Phone: (705) 737-1532
Fax: 7057373703 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kevin F. Ali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ali ( CPSO# 96374 )

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital of Barrie
Department of Family Medicine
405-201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:29 Jan 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KEVIN FAREEZ ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2013
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2017