skip to content

Ali, Farah

CPSO#: 93442

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Jan 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jan 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Lower Jarvis Street
Toronto ON  M5E 1Z2
Phone: 647-827-9200
Fax: 647-827-9202 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

40 Old Kingston Road
Toronto ON  M1E 3J5
Canada
Phone: (416) 284-0828
Fax: (416) 284-5595
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Farah Ali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 20 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Ali ( CPSO# 93442 )

Business Address:
40 Old Kingston Road
Toronto ON  M5A 1M6
Phone Number: (416) 419-4462

Business Address:
10 Lower Javis Street
Toronto ON  M5E 1Z2
Phone Number: (647) 827-9200

Business Address:
60 Carlton Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1J2
Phone Number: (416) 646-1890

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FARAH ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2014