skip to content

Ali, Asser Adel Ahmed

CPSO#: 89936

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Nov 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Nov 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Alexandria, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa Health Service
100 Marie-Curie Private
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone: 613-564-3950
Fax: 613-564-6627 Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Oct 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ASSER ADEL AHMED ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2008 to 12 Jan 2009
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2009 to 20 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2009 to 20 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2010 to 25 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2010
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2015
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2019