skip to content

Ali Al-Kazely, Luay Hussein

CPSO#: 87421

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al-Mustansiriyah, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Nebo Medical Center
260 Nebo road
Unit #1
Hamilton ON  L8W 3K5
Phone: (905) 381-9800
Fax: (905) 381-9807 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

370 Argyle Street South
Caledonia ON  N3W 2N2
Canada
Phone: (289) 960-0733
Fax: (289) 960-0739
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Luay Ali Al-Kazely Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Ali Al-Kazely ( CPSO# 87421 )

Business Address:
1 - 260 Nebo Road
Hamilton ON  L8W 3K5
Phone Number: (905) 381-9800

Business Address:
370 Argyle Street South
Caledonia ON  N3W 2N2
Phone Number: (905) 381-9800

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:07 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LUAY HUSSEIN ALI AL-KAZELY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI AL-KAZELY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2007

Concerns

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: March 10, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
An application for judicial review of the decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee has been commenced in the Divisional Court.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: December 14, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP:

Note: All of the elements of this SCERP have been completed, effective March 30, 2020.
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: December 14, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP:

Note: All of the elements of this SCERP have been completed, effective March 30, 2020.
Download Full Document (PDF)