skip to content

Ali, Adib Sultana

CPSO#: 88677

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rexdale Community Health Centre
222 Dixon Rd
Etobicoke ON  M9P 3S5
Phone: (416) 744-0066 Ext. 3234 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

105 Father Tobin Road
Brampton ON  L6R 0W9
Canada
Phone: 9057891750
Fax: 9057891787
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ADIB SULTANA ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2010