skip to content

Alhussein, Mosaad Abdulaziz M

CPSO#: 96411

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Sep 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 205
100 Pertosa Dr
Brampton ON  L6X 0H9
Phone: (905) 796-7333
Fax: (905) 796-7370 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

2065 Finch Ave. West
Suite 212
Toronto ON  M3N 2V7
Canada
Phone: (647) 477-6151
Fax: 8666926954
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:02 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOSAAD ABDULAZIZ M ALHUSSEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALHUSSEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Jul 2017
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2013