skip to content

Alhussaini, Anhar Abdullah H

CPSO#: 95041

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 May 2022

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education: King Abdul Aziz University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1200 Fourth Ave
Niagara Health - St Catharines Site
Department of Medicine - Cardiology
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:18 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANHAR ABDULLAH H ALHUSSAINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALHUSSAINI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 20 May 2011 to 28 Jun 2011
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 29 Jun 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 31 May 2021
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 May 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 2022