skip to content

Alhrbi, Mashael Mufarrij

CPSO#: 85242

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Oct 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Oct 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Science Center
820 Sherbrook Street
Winnipeg MB  R3A 1R9
Phone: 204-787-3837

Additional Practice Location(s)

Brant Community Healthcare System
200 Terrace Hill
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Canada
Phone: 1(519)7515544
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 MacKay street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Canada
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Canada
County: County of Perth
Electoral District: 02

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective:31 Jul 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MASHAEL MUFARRIJ ALHRBI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALHRBI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jun 2006 to 31 Jul 2006
PEAP - R - Nuclear Medicine

Western University, 01 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Nuclear Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2007 to 02 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Nuclear Medicine

Western University, 03 Aug 2007 to 02 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Nuclear Medicine

Western University, 03 Aug 2008 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Nuclear Medicine

Western University, 01 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nuclear Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nuclear Medicine

Western University, 31 Jul 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nuclear Medicine

Western University, 01 Sep 2011 to 31 Aug 2012
CF - Nuclear Medicine

Western University, 15 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Nuclear Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
CF - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2013