skip to content

Alhammad, Fahad Abdullah S

CPSO#: 96725

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Aug 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 18 Jan 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 29 Aug 2011 to 02 Oct 2011
EL - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 18 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 17 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 18 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 17 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 18 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Aug 2015
CF - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Aug 2015