skip to content

Alhammad, Abdullah Ibrahim A

CPSO#: 97129

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2012 to 23 Mar 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 24 Mar 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2015