skip to content

Alghamdi, Khalid Hassan Saleh

CPSO#: 95359

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Jun 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 73953 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Khalid Alghamdi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 2 2019

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta
British Columbia
Saudi Arabia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KHALID HASSAN SALEH ALGHAMDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALGHAMDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jun 2016 to 26 Jun 2016
CF - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2011