skip to content

Alfonsi, Jeffrey Earnest

CPSO#: 98180

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
Room B9-122
London ON  N6G 2V4
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: 519-663-3614 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
Phone: (905) 813-2200
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
Phone: 905-813-2200
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jeffrey E Alfonsi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Alfonsi ( CPSO# 98180 )

Business Address:
LHSC University Hospital
Room B9-122
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3881

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology Effective:26 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JEFFREY EARNEST ALFONSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALFONSI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016