skip to content

Alfawwaz, Fahad Saleh A

CPSO#: 99440

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2012 to 30 Nov 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2013