skip to content

Alfakeh, Sulhi Ali S

CPSO#: 95002

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 25 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Centre for Additction and Mental Health 1001 Queen St W, Toronto ON M6J 1H4
Date Received: 31 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:16 May 2018 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective:26 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 May 2011 to 23 Jul 2011
PEAP - R - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 24 Jul 2011 to 23 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 24 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 24 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 23 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 24 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017