skip to content

Aleykina, Natalya Oleksandrivna

CPSO#: 85117

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Jan 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:Zaporozhye State Medical University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
149 north Murray St
Trenton ON  K8V 6R8
Phone: (613) 394-5676
Fax: (613) 394-2895 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Natalya Oleksandrivna Aleykina Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 23 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Aleykina ( CPSO# 85117 )

Business Address:
149 North Murray Street
Trenton ON  K8V 6R8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NATALYA OLEKSANDRIVNA ALEYKINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALEYKINA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2013