skip to content

Alexieva, Nedalina Kaneva

CPSO#: 92398

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Med Univ of Varna Dr. Paraskev Stoyanov, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Bowmanville
Emergency Department
47 Liberty Str South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone: (905) 623-3331 Ext. 21381 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Nedalina Alexieva Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Alexieva ( CPSO# 92398 )

Business Address:
72 Whitehorn Cres
North York ON  M2J 3B2
Phone Number: 647-963-7373

Business Address:
1615 Dundas Stree East
Suite 17X
Durham ON  L1N 2L1
Phone Number: (905) 240-6500

Business Address:
47 Liberty Street South
Emergency Room
Clarington ON  L1C 2N4
Phone Number: (905) 623-3331

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NEDALINA KANEVA ALEXIEVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALEXIEVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 21 Mar 2010
PEAP - CF - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
AVP - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2012

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: July 12, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:

NOTE: All elements of this SCERP have been completed, effective July 3, 2019.
Download Full Document (PDF)