skip to content

Alexandre, Maria Teresa Silva Torres Almeida

CPSO#: 95001

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Lisboa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 May 2011 to 14 May 2011
PEAP - Resident - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 15 May 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
Elective Trainee - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 May 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2011