skip to content

Alexander, Natasha Louise

CPSO#: 96576

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 May 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
301-491 Eglinton Ave W
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone: 416-848-7665
Fax: 416-848-7664 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Natasha Alexander Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 10 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Alexander ( CPSO# 96576 )

Business Address:
301-491 Eglinton Ave W
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone Number: 416 848 7665

Business Address:
208 - 568 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 1P2
Phone Number: (416) 489-3263

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric Hematology/Oncology Effective:02 Oct 2020 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NATASHA LOUISE ALEXANDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALEXANDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 15 Jul 2011 to 07 Oct 2011
AVP - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 08 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 2014