skip to content

Alexander, Michael Arthur Joseph

CPSO#: 28160

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 May 1976
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 May 1976
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Lagos, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Shouldice Hospital Ltd. Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 08 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL ARTHUR JOSEPH ALEXANDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALEXANDER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 May 1976

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: January 25, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

Note: This matter has been appealed to HPARB by the subject physician.
Download Full Document (PDF)