skip to content

Alexander, John Peter

CPSO#: 24347

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Sep 1975
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Sep 1975

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
TLC Laser Eye Centers
200 Columbia Street
Waterloo, Ontario
Waterloo ON  N2L 3G1
Phone: 519-888-4502 Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:14 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOHN PETER ALEXANDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALEXANDER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1971
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1971
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 May 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1975