skip to content

Alenezi, Shuliweeh Menwer R

CPSO#: 92628

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
King Saud University Medical City
Riyadh 12372
Saudi Arabia
Phone: +966(11)467001

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. S. Alenezi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 23 2019

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Saudi Arabia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective:26 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHULIWEEH MENWER R ALENEZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALENEZI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2010 to 18 Jun 2010
PEAP - R - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 19 Jun 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 15 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 16 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 16 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2015