skip to content

Alenezi, Saud A H Z

CPSO#: 86402

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 11 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Jul 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kuwait University Faculty of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective:11 Jul 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jun 2007 to 06 Jul 2007
PEAP - R - Nuclear Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 07 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Nuclear Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 10 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Nuclear Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 11 Aug 2008 to 10 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Nuclear Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 11 Aug 2009 to 10 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nuclear Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 11 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nuclear Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 11 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jul 2011