skip to content

Aleksova, Natasha

CPSO#: 95266

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4022-3080 Yonge Street
Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: 647-347-6644
Fax: 647-347-6647 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville St,
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-6400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

University Health Network
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1L7
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:18 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NATASHA ALEKSOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALEKSOVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Sep 2019
CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 31 Dec 2021
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 2019