skip to content

Alderbas, Sarah M Y J D J

CPSO#: 97492

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 May 2012
EXPIRY DATE
02 Sep 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education as of 08 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Kuwait University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: 416 978-6976 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Aug 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SARAH M Y J D J ALDERBAS shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALDERBAS is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. ALDERBAS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALDERBAS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALDERBAS shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALDERBAS is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALDERBAS no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 02 Sep 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 16 May 2012 to 07 Aug 2012
PEAP - Resident - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 08 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 07 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 08 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 07 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 08 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 07 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 08 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 04 Sep 2018
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 05 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 02 Sep 2019
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 May 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Sep 2019