skip to content

Alberts, Melissa

CPSO#: 86011

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 11 Mar 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Pretoria School of Medicin, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Hendrik and Dr. Melissa Alberts Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 19 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: 7-20 Highway 20 Fonthill ON L0S 1E0
Date Received: 03 Jun 2019


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



South Africa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2019