skip to content

Albert, Odette Paulette

CPSO#: 28599

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jun 1985
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 06 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Dec 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jun 1985