skip to content

Kadri, Albert

CPSO#: 68236

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 09 Aug 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 31 Jul 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. A. Kadri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kadri ( CPSO# 68236 )

Business Address:
2480 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 1L4
Phone Number: (519) 946-0103

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.


Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  June 1, 2018
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On June 1, 2018, Windsor Regional Hospital (“WRH”) notified the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, pursuant to s.33 of the Public Hospitals Act and s.85.5 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that Dr. Albert Kadri’s privileges at WRH were suspended on an immediate mid-term basis, effective June 1, 2018.

On February 4, 2019, WRH provided an update to the College of its notice of June 1, 2018. The update notified the College, pursuant to s.33 of the Public Hospitals Act and s.85.5 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that Dr. Kadri has not been re-appointed to the professional staff of WRH for the 2017/2018 and 2018/2019 credentialing years and that the suspension of his privileges will continue pending Dr. Kadri exhausting his rights of appeal under the Public Hospital Act.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective:09 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1998
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2020
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 31 Jul 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 13 Aug 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 18 Sep 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 07 May 2021
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2022

Pending Hearings

Summary:

Allegations of Dr. Albert Kadri’s professional misconduct have been referred to what is now the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal. It is alleged that Dr. Kadri failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care of patients and that he is incompetent. It is also alleged that Dr. Kadri contravened a term, condition or limitation on his certificate of registration; failed to respond appropriately or within a reasonable time to a written inquiry from the College and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. The allegations relate to Dr. Kadri’s failure to comply with an Order of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College; his conduct during the College’s investigation; his disruptive and unprofessional conduct in dealing with staff and administrators at a Hospital and in relation to his management of patients who were also patients at the Hospital; his inappropriate and/or unprofessional communications and/or advocacy with patients in relation to the Hospital; unprofessional conduct in relation to OHIP billing; his conduct in relation to disseminating misleading information about the Ontario Renal Network; and his conduct in relation to recruitment of a junior physician and representations made to the junior physician.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): Motion: July 22, 2022; Merits: November 3, 4, 7-11, 14-18, 28-30, 2022 and December 1, 2, 5-7, 2022.