skip to content

Albar, Nezar Yassin Ali

CPSO#: 85586

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 07 Nov 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 11 Sep 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2008 to 07 Nov 2008
CF - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Nov 2008