skip to content

Alazem, Hana Ferlan

CPSO#: 100404

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C H E O Department of Pediatrics
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8C1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2440 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Hetz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Alazem ( CPSO# 100404)
Dr. S. Hetz ( CPSO# 100892)

Business Address:
11 Holland Avenue
Suite 400
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4S1
Phone Number: (613) 706-0897

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HANA FERLAN ALAZEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALAZEM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018