skip to content

Alawsi, Maysarah A

CPSO#: 89761

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Sep 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Sep 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6-1534 Queensbury Cres
Oakville ON  L6H 4G5
Phone: (905) 339 0110
Fax: (905) 338 9797 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Maysarah Alawsi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Alawsi ( CPSO# 89761 )

Business Address:
261 Oak Walk Drive
Oakville ON  L6H 6M3
Phone Number: (905) 257-8004

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Sep 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MAYSARAH A ALAWSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALAWSI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2008 to 24 Nov 2008
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 25 Nov 2008 to 01 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2009 to 01 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2010