skip to content

Alatishe, Yuri Adetokunboh

CPSO#: 96590

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Jan 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University School of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Healthcare Hamilton
West 5th Campus
100 5th Street West PO Box 585
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone: (905) 388-2511
Fax: (905) 575-6038 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

East Region Mental Health Services
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Canada
Phone: (905) 573-4801
Fax: (905) 573-4802
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Y.A. Alatishe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Alatishe ( CPSO# 96590 )

Business Address:
St Josephs Healthcare Hamilton
West 5th Campus
100 West 5th Street
PO Box 585
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone Number: (905) 388-2511

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. YURI ADETOKUNBOH ALATISHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALATISHE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 18 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 17 Jul 2012
CF - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2012