skip to content

Alassaf, Hossam Abdullah M

CPSO#: 94956

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Aug 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Qassim University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 08 Apr 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PEAP - R - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Radiation Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Jul 2017
CF - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2017